DE HB144 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill serves to better define and limit what real property rights the Department of Transportation may acquire. It also corrects a technical error that if left unchanged, will jeopardize the use of federal funds on transportation projects due to non-conformance with the National Environmental Policy Act and federal highway regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 17 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Acquisition Of Real Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2017-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 28 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 2 to HB 144 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-29 Amendment HA 1 to HB 144 - Stricken in House
2017-06-13 Amendment HA 2 to HB 144 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-04-25 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback