DE HB143 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Section 1 of this Act clarifies the definition of the term policy for purposes of ยงยง 3903-3907 of Title 18 of the Delaware Code to apply only to personal automobile insurance policies and not commercial or other types of policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 18 And 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Automobile Insurance Policies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-23 Signed by Governor
2019-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2019-06-21 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2019-06-20 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2019-05-15 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 12 On Its Merits
2019-05-07 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback