DE HB142 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act will improve guidelines for training by school districts and charters as it pertains to School Resource Officers (SRO), their duties and training when interacting with students with disabilities. The limitations and prohibitions described in this section are in addition to, and not in derogation of, any other constitutional, statutory, or regulatory rights otherwise conferred by federal or state law or regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Limitations On The Use Of Seclusion And Restraint.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29 Signed by Governor
2017-06-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-06-13 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2017-06-13 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 5 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2017-04-25 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback