DE HB142 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates a special license plate for retired professional firefighters.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special License Or Registration Plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-22 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-03-22 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2016-03-16 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-03-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2015-05-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |