DE HB141 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires all candidates for statewide office, the General Assembly, and all elected county offices, to request a criminal history background check, no later than the filing deadline, from the State Bureau of Identification. The State Bureau of Identification must, within 10 days of receipt of the request, provide the Commissioner of Elections with a report of the candidates criminal history or a statement that the Bureaus Repository contains no information relating to the candidate. The Commissioner of Elections must then determine if the candidate is qualified under Section 21 of Article II of the Delaware Constitution to be considered a candidate and have their name appear on the ballot. The candidate will be considered a provisional candidate until the Commissioner of Elections determines the candidate is qualified. The information obtained by the Commissioner of Elections, from the Bureau, will not fall under the definition of public record in Chapter 100 of Title 29. The candidate must pay the cost of the criminal history background check, but the cost may be reimbursed from the candidates campaign funds as an authorized campaign expenditure. This Act will take effect January 1 after enactment.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 11 And 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Criminal History Background Checks For Candidates For State And County Public Office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-31 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2023-06-28 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 141 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2023-06-28 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 141 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-08 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2023-06-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 7 NO 8 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 141 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2023-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-05-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |