DE HB141 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act authorizes the Family Court to interview a child outside the presence of the parties for the purpose of obtaining the child's testimony and ascertaining the truth of a matter asserted by a party to a Protection from Abuse proceeding. The Court may permit counsel to be present during the interview and ask the child questions. The Court may also permit a party who is not present for the interview to submit questions of fact for the Court to use in interviewing the child. Interviews under this Act must be made a part of the record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Family Court Procedure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27 Signed by Governor
2017-06-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-08 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-05-12 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-05-11 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2017-04-13 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback