DE HB140 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This non-punitive, public-health oriented bill seeks to codify certain sections of the federal law known as the Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act (CAPTA), as amended by the Comprehensive Addiction and Recovery Act (CARA), that requires states to have policies and procedures in place to address the needs of infants born with and identified as being affected by substance abuse, withdrawal symptoms, or Fetal Alcohol Spectrum Disorder, including a requirement that healthcare providers involved in the delivery or care of such infant notify the child protection services system. This bill formalizes a uniform, collaborative response protocol for the development of a Plan of Safe Care for infants with prenatal substance exposure and their affected family or caregivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Infants With Prenatal Substance Exposure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07 Signed by Governor
2018-05-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-04-25 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-04-24 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-04-24 Amendment HA 1 to HB 140 - Stricken in House
2018-04-18 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2017-06-01 Amendment HA 1 to HB 140 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-11 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2017-04-13 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback