DE HB139 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The Business Enterprise Program (BEP) of the Division of Health and Social Services, Division of the Visually Impaired, broadens economic opportunities for blind residents of Delaware by creating snack bars, cafeterias, and vending route facilities on federal, State and municipal properties. Under federal law (20 U.S.C. 107) and state law (16 Del. C. 9606), BEP is granted priority to operate vending facilities on federal and State property. The amendment allows licensed participants in BEP to purchase materials and nonprofessional services under any central contract negotiated by the State.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2014-01-14 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-05-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |