DE HB138 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill replaces the National Change of Address process with another non-discriminatory process of cancelling the registrations of persons who are no longer permanent residents of Delaware. It also gives the Department of Elections, instead of the State Board of Elections, the authority to cancel registrations of persons who authorize the cancellation of their registrations because they are no longer permanent residents of Delaware.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-06-22 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2017-05-22 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-05-18 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-18 Amendment HA 1 to HB 138 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-18 Amendment HA 1 to HB 138 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-04-13 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback