DE HB134 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act establishes an Educational Support Professional of the year award program throughout the State. Through this legislation, the state will formally honor and recognize the work educational support professionals, such as paraprofessionals, food service workers, custodians, and secretaries do to enhance school communities in Delaware.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Educational Support Professionals Of The Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24 Signed by Governor
2018-03-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-01-17 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2018-01-11 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-01-11 Amendment HA 1 to HB 134 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 5 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2017-04-13 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback