DE HB134 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill makes the statutory scheme for expungement of adult criminal offenses more efficient and, by doing so, will require less Superior Court resources. By including the successful completion of “probation before judgment” within the definition of “terminated in favor of the accused” the legislation improves an inadvertent drafting oversight. Previously, all requests for expungement of probation before judgment cases had to be presented to the court via the discretionary expungement process, regardless of nature of the charge, simply because “probation before judgment” was not specifically included within the definition of “terminated in favor of the accused.” Section 1 addresses cases before the Family Court and Section 2 addresses all other cases.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 10 And 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Expungement Of Adult Arrest Records.
Sponsors
Rep. James Johnson [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Michael Barbieri [D] | Rep. Deborah Hudson [R] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2013-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2013-05-09 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Judiciary Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |