DE HB133 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill would create an end date for the special filing deadline created by school board vacancies that arise after the second Friday in February. The new end date for these vacancies would be the first Friday in March. Any vacancies that arise after the first Friday in March would be filled by the remaining members on the School Board for the remainder of the fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To School Board Elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02 Signed by Governor
2017-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 12 YES 6 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT
2017-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-10 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2017-04-13 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback