DE HB132 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act changes the definition of tavern from an establishment with a special space and accommodation for sale of beer by the glass for consumption on the premises to an establishment with a special space and accommodation for sale of beer and wine in single servings. The Act also revises ยง 513 to allow any person in charge of a tavern to apply to the Commissioner for a license to purchase from an importer and to receive, keep and sell beer and wine instead of only beer. The beer and wine must be consumed on the premises where sold.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Taverns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2021-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-08 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-03 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-04-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |
2021-03-23 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |