DE HB130 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill expands upon the existing at-store recycling program regarding the use of single-use plastic bags. The existing requirements will continue, however stores subject to this program will now be limited from providing single-use plastic bags for only specific uses thereby encouraging a shift to reusable bags. The purpose of the bill, as detailed in the preamble, is to clean up Delawares communities and watersheds, reduce storm water and trash management costs to taxpayers, and promote the health and safety of watersheds, wildlife and humans, and the ecosystems food chain. On January 1, 2021 this bill enacts a ban on stores providing single-use plastic bags at check-out.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Recycling And Waste Reduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-06 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO | |
2019-06-06 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 130 - Stricken in Senate | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental & Natural Resources) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-15 | Assigned to Environmental & Natural Resources Committee in Senate | |
2019-05-14 | Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 7 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-05-14 | Amendment HA 5 to HB 130 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-05-14 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 130 - Stricken in House | |
2019-05-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 130 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-05-14 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 130 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-14 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 130 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-18 | Introduced in House and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee |