DE HB129 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Currently, communities in the program only get reimbursed for snow events equal to or greater than 4 inches. This bill allows communities in the snow reimbursement program with the Delaware Department of Transportation that have schools within their development to seek reimbursement for the plowing costs of the feeder street leading to the school for snow events equal to or greater than 2 and less than 4 inches. The same conditions for snowstorm reimbursement apply to reimbursement under this bill.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 17 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Snow Removal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee (TRANSPORTATION/LAND USE AND INFRASTRUCTURE) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |