DE HB128 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act permits the extension of special education and related services to those students with a disability who turn 21 during the 2020-2021 school year to address unfinished learning as a result of the pandemic which resulted in the COVID-19 Declaration of a State of Emergency for the State of Delaware Due to a Public Health Threat declared by the Governor on March 12, 2020. The IEP for the child must be revised to reflect the specific basis for extending services and the specific education and related services that will be provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Exceptional Children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03 Signed by Governor
2021-05-19 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-05-18 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2021-05-13 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2021-05-13 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-05-13 Amendment HA 1 to HB 128 - Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-05-13 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-05-06 Amendment HA 1 to HB 128 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2021-04-01 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2021-03-31 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 4 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2021-03-23 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback