DE HB127 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This legislation gives authority to the Executive Director of the Delaware Commission of Veterans Affairs to use the term Delaware Office of Veterans Services when carrying out the work of the Commission. This will enable the Executive Director and other staff of the Commission to conduct business under a banner that better describes their role as providers of services to Delaware veterans and their families. Applying the name Delaware Office of Veterans Services also serves to distinguish the office from the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs and will help alleviate confusion among members of the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Commission Of Veterans Affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate
2019-05-14 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2019-05-08 Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 13 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2019-05-02 Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback