DE HB127 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill updates Title 26 relating to the requirements for obtaining a certificate to operate in Delaware as a new electric transmission utility. This bill uses language similar to certificate requirements for water, wastewater, and other utility services under the jurisdiction of the Public Service Commission (Commission). Due to recent changes in federal law, certain projects will now be available to entities both in and out of state. In order to perform this type of work in Delaware, a company will need to obtain a certificate from the Commission. Currently, there are no qualifications defined for the Commission to assess the impact a project of this nature will have on Delaware and its citizens. This bill will provide the Commission with the necessary authority to assess that impact and revoke a certificate in the future for good cause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 26 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14 Signed by Governor
2018-01-23 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-05-12 Assigned to Environmental, Natural Resources & Energy Committee in Senate
2017-05-11 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-05-11 Amendment HA 1 to HB 127 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-11 Amendment HA 1 to HB 127 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Energy) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2017-04-06 Introduced and Assigned to Energy Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback