DE HB127 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 16 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-16 - HS 1 for HB 127 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 16 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-16 - HS 1 for HB 127 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill reenacts provisions of the law relating to vehicles used for agricultural purposes which were inadvertently removed through the passage of HB364 by the 144th General Assembly. The Act provides allowable axle load limits for single unit vehicles, combination unit vehicles and total gross weight of any combination of vehicles being used for agricultural purposes. The act also provides a 3% margin of error so that farmers do not, as a result of an inability to weigh vehicles in the field, inadvertently violate the statute transporting seasonal loads.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Size And Weight Of Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-16 | HS 1 for HB 127 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-10 | HS 1 FOR HB 127 - Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in Senate with 3 Favorable | |
2009-06-04 | HS 1 for HB 127 - Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |
2009-05-12 | HS 1 for HB 127 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-05-06 | HS 1 for HB 127 - Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2009-05-06 | HS 1 for HB 127 - Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security | |
2009-05-06 | Substituted by HS 1 for HB 127 | |
2009-04-09 | Introduced in House and assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee | |
2009-04-09 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |