DE HB126 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]


The Child Care and Development Block Grant Act of 2014 mandated that states allow families that receive child care assistance to continue receiving that assistance for at least 90 days after losing their job provided they are seeking employment during that time. The federal law did not expressly stipulate that states must allow families to qualify for and begin receiving assistance so that they could search for a job, however 14 states have enacted policies to expand eligibility to those families. This legislation codifies the federal intent that families be eligible to continue receiving assistance for 90 non-consecutive days in a year, and extends that eligibility to families who want to start receiving assistance in order to seek employment for up to 90 days.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Child Care Assistance.


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-01-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-07-12 Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
2017-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2017-06-30 Amendment HA 1 to HB 126 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-06-01 Amendment HA 1 to HB 126 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2017-04-05 Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources

Bill Comments