DE HB124 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill modifies the impact of criminal history on an applicants eligibility for licensure. It gives the Board discretion to grant waivers for felony convictions for crimes committed against a person where more than 3 years have elapsed, and more than 2 years have elapsed for other felonies. The Board is precluded from considering a conviction where more than 10 years have elapsed since the date of conviction.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Plumbing, Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning And Refrigeration Examiners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-18 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NO 2 ABSENT | |
2019-05-08 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-18 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |