DE HB123 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act supports children who spent part or all of their teen years in the State's foster care system to access higher education by providing a tuition waiver program to cover the cost of tuition, fees, and (where offered) room and board at a public Delaware college or university.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Financial Assistance For Higher Education For Youth Who Have Been In Foster Care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-21 Signed by Governor
2021-06-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2021-06-29 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2021-06-22 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2021-06-22 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 NO
2021-06-16 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 4 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2021-06-08 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback