DE HB123 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill revises the statutory provisions relating to reciprocity requirements for barbers, cosmetologists, and aestheticians. Currently an applicant from a state with licensure standards less stringent than those of Delaware must show 5 continuous years of practice in the other state immediately preceding application to Delaware, in order to receive a Delaware license under reciprocity provisions. Under this revision, the applicant is required to show work in the other jurisdiction for 3 out of the last 5 years. This will offer more flexibility for the applicant who has had a break in employment in his or her profession but nevertheless ensures that reciprocity applicants have sufficient experience.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Cosmetology, Barbering, And Licensure Of Aestheticians.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Assigned to Committee in Senate |
2015-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2015-05-05 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |