DE HB123 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill continues the practice of amending periodically the Delaware Revised Uniform Partnership Act (the "Act") to keep it current and to maintain its national preeminence. The following is a section-by-section review of the proposed amendments of the Act. Section 1. This section amends 15-504(d) of the Act to confirm that a charging order is the sole and exclusive remedy by which a judgment creditor of a partner or a partner's transferee may satisfy a judgment out of the judgment debtor's economic interest and that attachment, garnishment, foreclosure or other legal or equitable remedies are not available to the judgment creditor. Sections 2, 4, 5 and 6. Sections 2, 4, 5 and 6 amend the provisions of the Act relating to domestication, transfer, continuance and conversion to confirm that in connection with a domestication, transfer, continuance or conversion, rights or securities of, or interests in, an entity that is domesticating or converting to a partnership and rights or securities of, or interests in, a partnership that is transferring to or domesticating or continuing in another jurisdiction or converting to a different type of entity or another jurisdiction may remain outstanding in connection with such domestication, transfer, continuance or conversion. Section 3. This section amends the provisions of the Act relating to mergers to confirm that rights or securities of, or interests in, a constituent party that is the surviving entity in a merger may remain outstanding in connection with the merger. Section 7. This section provides that the proposed amendments of the Act shall become effective August 1, 2013.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Creation, Regulation, Operation And Dissolution Of Domestic Partnerships And The Registration And Regulation Of Foreign Limited Liability Partnerships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2013-06-04 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 4 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2013-05-08 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |