DE HB122 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill provides greater protection to correctional officers and other state employees who are assaulted in detention facilities by prohibiting assaults committed with a reckless state of mind.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Assaults In A Detention Facility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-08 Signed by Governor
2017-05-10 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2017-05-02 Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
2017-05-02 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback