DE HB120 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Passed on September 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This Act requires health insurance policies to cover any medically appropriate drug approved by the FDA for the treatment of stage 4 metastatic cancer without requiring a patient to first prove that the patient failed to respond to a different drug or drugs. This Act is based on a similar bill in Georgia that was inspired by President Jimmy Carters recent battle with cancer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance Coverage Of Certain Cancer Treatments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-20 Signed by Governor
2017-06-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-05-10 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2017-05-09 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-05-09 Amendment HA 1 to HB 120 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-09 Amendment HA 1 to HB 120 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-05-03 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2017-03-30 Introduced in House and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback