DE HB119 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Passed on October 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Passed on October 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes Juneteenth as a State holiday. Juneteenth commemorates the emancipation of the last enslaved African Americans in the United States. The Act adds Juneteenth as a legal holiday and reduces the number of floating holidays from 2 to 1. The two floating holidays were created by the 145th General Assembly as replacements for Presidents Day and Columbus Day. This Act replaces the floating holiday that replaced Columbus Day with a legal holiday to celebrate Juneteenth. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 1 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Legal Holidays.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 Favorable | |
2021-06-30 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-24 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-24 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 119 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-23 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 119 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-17 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |