DE HB118 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enables Sussex County to establish ordinances, rules, and regulations regarding property maintenance and penalties for violations of said ordinances, rules, and regulations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Part Iv Of The Delaware Code Relating To Property Maintenance.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Rep. Daniel Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2020-01-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2020-01-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-12-19 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 118 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 118 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 118 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-26 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 118 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-13 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 118 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-15 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 118 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-04-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House |