DE HB117 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill makes changes to the qualifications for professional land surveyors. This bill also makes clear that there is no civil or criminal trespass when a professional land surveyor enters upon land in the course of preparing a survey.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Professions And Occupations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2023-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2023-05-09 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |
2023-05-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2023-05-09 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 117 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2023-05-09 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 117 - Stricken in House | |
2023-05-09 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 117 - Stricken in House | |
2023-05-09 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 117 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-04-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 117 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-04-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |