DE HB115 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Sunset Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill requires Podiatrists, Dentists, Doctors, Nurses and Optometrists who issue prescriptions to utilize electronic prescriptions except under certain exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Prescriptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
2019-05-14 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT
2019-04-17 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2019-04-04 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback