DE HB115 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act permits individuals subject to the supervision of the Delaware Department of Correction to effect a name change based on a sincerely held gender-related identity.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Name Changes For Individuals Subject To The Supervision Of The Delaware Department Of Correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 5 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADULT & JUVENILE CORRECTIONS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to Adult & Juvenile Corrections Committee in Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 30 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee (CORRECTIONS) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House |