DE HB114 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-5)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

The purpose of this amendment is to better protect the motorists of the State of Delaware by raising the minimum automobile bodily injury and property damage limits to reflect the current economic conditions. The minimum automobile liability limits have not been raised in the State of Delaware since July 19, 1983. Most motor vehicle policies sold in Delaware provide $10,000 for property damage coverage. Bodily injury insurance proceeds are frequently used to cover the cost of not only pain and suffering, but an injured persons medical expenses and lost wages, which have increased since 1983. For example, $15,000 in 1983 is equivalent to $35,960.54 in 2016, based on the federal Consumer Price Index Urban statistics for 1983 and 2016. In addition, $30,000 in 1983 is equivalent to $71,921.08 in 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Bodily Injury And Property Damage Coverage On Motor Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13 Signed by Governor
2017-06-13 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-05-17 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2017-05-16 Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 5 NO 2 ABSENT
2017-05-16 Amendment HA 1 to HB 114 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2017-05-16 Amendment HA 1 to HB 114 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback