DE HB113 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This bill changes the earned income tax credit from nonrefundable to refundable. This bill creates a table for the percentage of earned income credit for tax years 2018 and after. Currently, if spouses file a joint federal return but separate State returns, only the spouse with the higher taxes due can use the State earned income tax credit. This bill eliminates that limitation starting with tax year 2018 and provides that the credit shall be divided equally between such spouses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Earned Income Tax Credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT
2018-07-01 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-07-01 Amendment SA 1 to HB 113 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-05-17 Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
2017-05-16 Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-05-16 Amendment HA 1 to HB 113 - Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
2017-05-09 Amendment HA 1 to HB 113 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 12 On Its Merits
2017-04-05 Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback