DE HB112 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act allows professional licensing boards and commissions administered by the Division of Professional Regulation to recognize military education, training, and experience of all current and former military personnel when reviewing credentials and issuing licenses. This is a change from the current law, which only allows such boards and commissions to do so for active duty military, members of the National Guard, or military reserves assigned to a duty station in Delaware. This change would recognize the military education, training, and experience of individuals who are retired, a veteran, or are active duty individuals assigned to duty stations located outside this State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Licenses And Permits Issued To Service Members And Their Spouses By Boards And Commissions Administered By The Division Of Professional Regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29 Signed by Governor
2017-06-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2017-05-17 Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2017-05-05 Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate
2017-05-04 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2017-04-26 Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 10 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback