DE HB112 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Like all judges within the state, the judges of the Justice of the Peace Court are subject to the jurisdiction of the Court on the Judiciary. This Act is the first leg of a constitutional amendment that would add the Chief Magistrate to the Court on the Judiciary so that the presiding judge of each of the six state courts serves as a member.
Title
An Act Proposing An Amendment To Article Iv, 37 Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To The Court On The Judiciary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Enact w/o Sign by Governor |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 4 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits |
2015-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |