DE HB11 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill, modeled after similar legislation enacted in Pennsylvania and West Virginia, clarifies paramedic immunity when consent to render care is unable to be obtained.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Paramedic Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-01-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 8 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |