DE HB109 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates a new statute that is patterned after and replaces the substantial assistance provision in Delaware’s drug trafficking statute but that is broader as it applies to any criminal sentencing. It provides the Attorney General the discretion to move sentencing court to sentence a convicted defendant who has provided substantial assistance to the State to a lesser term than is otherwise called for by law or to modify or reduce the sentence of one who has been previously sentenced and provides substantial assistance. This Act allows a sentencing court to suspend or reduce minimum mandatory sentences for those who provide substantial assistance to law enforcement.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 11 And 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Substantial Assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Sen. Brian Bushweller [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] |
Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Rep. Darryl Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-06-10 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-03 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2009-04-30 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2009-04-09 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-04-09 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-09 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2009-04-08 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |