DE HB104 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-13)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The state is currently funding service providers at 75% of the market rate established in a 2014 study that was done by DHSS. This bill would mandate an increase in the rates paid to service providers according to the recommendations of the market study, so that by fiscal year 2021 the state would fund service providers at 100% of the benchmarked rate. These rate increases are necessary to increase the hourly wages of Direct Support Professionals (DSPs), to improve recruitment and retention of these positions, to decrease staff turnover, and to decrease position vacancies. Along with the corresponding costs for program oversight, direct supervision of DSPs, and training, stabilizing the DSP workforce with increased pay is essential to keep people with I/DD safe and integrated to the maximum extent possible in their local communities. The bill also requires that the adequacy of the rate system be evaluated against performance measures that are commonly used to assess program quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Services For Adults With Intellectual And Developmental Disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-27 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-27 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-06-21 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-14 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-10 Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 104, and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback