DE HB103 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Act amends Section 916 of Title 11 of the Code so that the statutory penalties for the crime of home improvement fraud increase as the amount of the loss to the victim increases, using the same scale applicable to Theft under Section 841 of Title 11 and New Home Construction Fraud under Section 917 of Title 11. Like Theft under Section 841 of Title 11, the amendment also provides for an increase in the level of the offense for amounts under $50,000 where the victim is 62 years of age or older or an "adult who is impaired" or a "person with a disability" as defined in the Code. The Act also amends the definition of "home improvement contract" to provide that a victim's payment can be in any form, not just money, and to clarify that a "home improvement contract" includes all agreements for labor, services and materials to be furnished and performed under the home improvement contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Home Improvement Fraud

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09 Signed by Governor
2018-04-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-01-23 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-01-23 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2017-03-30 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback