DE HB101 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
As to the Charter of the City of Newark, this bill requests that the General Assembly require that nominating petitions relative to candidates for Mayor and Council be filed by the Monday which is 60 days prior to the election of same.
Title
An Act Amending The City Of Newark Charter, Being Chapter 152 Of Volume 48, Laws Of Delaware, Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2013-06-04 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-04 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2013-04-30 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |