DE HB100 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-12)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-12)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes a mental health services unit for Delaware elementary schools. The unit is at a ratio of 250 full-time equivalent students grades K-5 for a full-time school counselor, school social worker, or licensed clinical social worker. Additionally a unit ratio of 700 full time equivalent students for grades K-5 for employment of a full-time school psychologist. This Act defines mental health services as prevention, response, and coordination services delivered to students in elementary schools.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Free Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-15 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-08 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2021-06-08 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2021-06-08 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 100 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2021-06-08 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 100 - Stricken | |
2021-06-08 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-04 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2021-06-03 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 100 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-04-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 100 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2021-03-11 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2021-03-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2021-01-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |