DE HB100 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-8)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The denial by private and public health benefit administrators of adequate coverage for substance abuse treatment has been identified as a major source of failed treatment efforts by persons addicted to controlled substances. These denials have also been identified as a cause of the shortage of adequate treatment facilities in Delaware. This Act seeks to ensure that persons with private and public insurance coverage have the ability to insist that they receive the substance abuse coverage to which they are entitled by law and by their insurance plans. It does so by (1) allowing the Department of Justice to provide legal assistance where appropriate to persons seeking benefits from the states Medicaid program, traditional health plans, or from employer-funded health benefit plans (which are exempt from state regulation), (2) requiring the states Medicaid program and private insurance carriers to provide notice to persons who are denied substance abuse treatment of the possibility of legal assistance in challenging those claim denials, and (3) permitting the Department of Justice to use funds in its Consumer Protection Fund to offset the cost of providing medical and legal expertise to DOJ and the Department of Insurance for the purpose of assisting persons with controlled substance addictions who are seeking treatment. This Act contains a sunset provision so that the General Assembly can assess the impact of its provisions on private and public health care costs and effective treatment of substance abuse before making its provisions permanent.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 6, 16, 18, And 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Treatment For Substance Abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 ABSENT | |
2017-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-04 | Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2017-04-04 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-03-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-23 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |