DE HB1 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-5)
Status: Enrolled on January 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This is the final leg of an amendment to the Delaware Constitution to provide equal rights on the basis of sex. There is no Equal Rights Amendment to the United States Constitution. While Congress passed the Amendment in 1972, it was not ratified by the requisite number of states by the 1982 deadline. Delaware, however, was one of the first states to ratify the Amendment. About half of the states across the country have passed Equal Rights Amendments to their state constitutions in order to provide protection against discrimination based on sex. Without an Equal Rights amendment, women's rights and protections are limited. This Amendment is necessary to correct a constitutional shortcoming, reduce sex-based disparities and to codify our State's value of equality. Section 1 makes clear the General Assembly's intent in proposing this Amendment to the Delaware Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Proposing An Amendment To Article I Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To Equal Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 NO
2019-01-16 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2019-01-10 Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2019-01-10 Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 NO
2019-01-09 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2018-12-13 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback