DC PR25-0716 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Resolution R25-0506, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007366
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Resolution R25-0506, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007366
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Board of Directors of the District of Columbia Housing Finance Agency Heather Wellington Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Board of Directors of the District of Columbia Housing Finance Agency Heather Wellington Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Council | Resolution R25-0506, Effective from Jun 11, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 007366 |
2024-06-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-06-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0506 |
2024-06-04 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2024-05-30 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0716 |
2024-05-29 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-05-28 | Council | Notice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary |
2024-05-23 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-05-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing |
2024-04-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0716 Published in the DC Register |
2024-04-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |