DC PR25-0573 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors Leif Dormsjo Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Title
Washington Convention and Sports Authority Board of Directors Leif Dormsjo Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Council | Withdrawn |
2023-12-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0573 Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2023-12-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR25-0573 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/54481/Introduction/PR25-0573-Introduction.pdf |