DC PR25-0550 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-15 - Resolution R25-0369, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-15 - Resolution R25-0369, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sign Regulations Second Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Sign Regulations Second Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-15 | Council | Resolution R25-0369, Effective from Dec 05, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015742 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0369 |
2023-12-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-12-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-12-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |