DC PR25-0529 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-29 - Resolution R25-0382, Effective from Dec 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Food Policy Director Caroline Howe Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Policy Director Caroline Howe Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-19 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-29CouncilResolution R25-0382, Effective from Dec 19, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 016608
2023-12-19CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R25-0382
2023-12-19CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-12-13CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2023-12-12CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR25-0529
2023-11-29CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-11-29CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2023-11-29CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2023-11-27CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-11-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR25-0529 Published in the DC Register
2023-11-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2023-11-02CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback