DC PR25-0514 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - Resolution R25-0338, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015045
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0043 with Edelson PC Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contract No. DCCB-2023-F-0043 with Edelson PC Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-17CouncilResolution R25-0338, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 015045
2023-11-07CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R25-0338
2023-11-07CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2023-11-07CouncilRetained by the Council
2023-11-01CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback