DC PR25-0510 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Resolution R25-0422, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001677
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Police Complaints Board Paul Ashton Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police Complaints Board Paul Ashton Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-16CouncilResolution R25-0422, Effective from Feb 06, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 001677
2024-02-06CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R25-0422
2024-02-06CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2024-01-30CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2024-01-25CouncilCommittee Mark-up of PR25-0510
2024-01-24CouncilNotice of Mark-up filed in the Office of Secretary
2023-11-10CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR25-0510 Published in the DC Register
2023-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-10-30CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback