DC PR25-0505 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Board of Dentistry John Bailey Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Dentistry John Bailey Confirmation Resolution of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-29CouncilRoundtable Hearing Held
2023-11-17CouncilWithdrawn
2023-11-17CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-11-08CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2023-11-07CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2023-11-03CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on PR25-0505 Published in the DC Register
2023-10-26CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback